Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lie Detection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 (SB0126/CH0139)
Title
Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 /CH0139 (HB0173)
Title
Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 (SB0126/CH0139) Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0773 Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0962 State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0126 /CH0139 (HB0173) Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0452 Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM