Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Lie Detection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 /CH0221 (SB0721)
Title
Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200 /CH0407 (SB0189)
Title
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189 (HB0200/CH0407)
Title
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0721 (HB0115/CH0221)
Title
Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0115 /CH0221 (SB0721) Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0200 /CH0407 (SB0189) State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination Delegate Cluster 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0189 (HB0200/CH0407) State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0721 (HB0115/CH0221) Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Senator Ready 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page