Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 (SB0404/CH0058)
Title
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202 /CH0473 (SB0186/CH0472)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 /CH0410
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 /CH0603
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1045 /CH0634
Title
Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Escrow Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368 (SB1083)
Title
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to Accept
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1529 (SB1095)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 /CH0125 (HB0180/CH0126)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0471
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0472 (HB0202/CH0473)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230
Title
Real Property - Priority of Refinance Mortgage Over Junior Liens - Amount of Refinance Mortgage
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0404 /CH0058 (HB0099)
Title
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0947
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1083 (HB1368)
Title
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1095 (HB1529)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 (SB0404/CH0058) Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement Delegate Arora 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0202 /CH0473 (SB0186/CH0472) Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Economic Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 /CH0410 Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0602 /CH0603 Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1045 /CH0634 Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Escrow Costs Delegate Arora 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 (SB1083) State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to Accept Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1371 Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1435 Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1529 (SB1095) Real Property - Ground Rents Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 /CH0125 (HB0180/CH0126) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0141 /CH0471 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0186 /CH0472 (HB0202/CH0473) Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Finance
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0230 Real Property - Priority of Refinance Mortgage Over Junior Liens - Amount of Refinance Mortgage Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0404 /CH0058 (HB0099) Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Finance
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0947 Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1083 (HB1368) State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1095 (HB1529) Real Property - Ground Rents Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM