Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0088
Title
Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387 /CH0593 (SB0912/CH0592)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538
Title
Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684 /CH0029 (SB0558)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 /CH0638 (SB0815)
Title
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 /CH0369 (SB0256/CH0368)
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners PG 412-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Bill - Statement of Lien PG 433-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1154 (SB0951)
Title
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 /CH0368 (HB1017/CH0369)
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0684/CH0029)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0815 (HB0989/CH0638)
Title
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 /CH0592 (HB0387/CH0593)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 (HB1154)
Title
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0088 Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0387 /CH0593 (SB0912/CH0592) Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Economic Matters
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0538 Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0684 /CH0029 (SB0558) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified Delegate Hammen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0989 /CH0638 (SB0815) Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1017 /CH0369 (SB0256/CH0368) Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners PG 412-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 Prince George's County - Property Tax Bill - Statement of Lien PG 433-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1154 (SB0951) Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Environment and Transportation
Judiciary
HB1306 Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle Forfeiture Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1496 Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1552 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 /CH0368 (HB1017/CH0369) Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners Senator Currie 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB0684/CH0029) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0761 Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0815 (HB0989/CH0638) Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0912 /CH0592 (HB0387/CH0593) Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0951 (HB1154) Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM