Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026 /CH0346 (SB0247/CH0347)
Title
Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - Liens
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Abandoned Private Cemeteries - Repair or Maintenance by County or Municipality
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453
Title
Tax Sales - Water Liens - Moratorium
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568
Title
Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Attorney's Liens - Settlement Providing for Conveyance of Real Property - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 /CH0618 (SB0957/CH0619)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1369 (SB0809/CH0481)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales of Common Elements and Common Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1567
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Release of Liens on Vacant Property PG 413-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 /CH0347 (HB0026/CH0346)
Title
Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529
Title
Condominiums - Delinquent Owners - Restrictions on Common Element Usage
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803
Title
Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 /CH0481 (HB1369)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales of Common Elements and Common Areas
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 /CH0619 (HB1168/CH0618)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 /CH0346 (SB0247/CH0347) Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2017 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0104 Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - Liens Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0235 Abandoned Private Cemeteries - Repair or Maintenance by County or Municipality Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0453 Tax Sales - Water Liens - Moratorium Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1077 Attorney's Liens - Settlement Providing for Conveyance of Real Property - Enforcement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 /CH0618 (SB0957/CH0619) Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1274 Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1369 (SB0809/CH0481) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales of Common Elements and Common Areas Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1496 Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1567 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Release of Liens on Vacant Property PG 413-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0247 /CH0347 (HB0026/CH0346) Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0529 Condominiums - Delinquent Owners - Restrictions on Common Element Usage Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0809 /CH0481 (HB1369) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales of Common Elements and Common Areas Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 /CH0619 (HB1168/CH0618) Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM