Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0096/CH0320)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 (SB0374)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 (SB0612)
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0730
Title
Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 (SB0255)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305 (SB0261/CH0224)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Child Support - Lien Against Monetary Award
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 /CH0261
Title
Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0320 (HB0161)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 /CH0224 (HB1305)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 (HB0250)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 /CH0225
Title
Tax Liens - Expiration
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557)
Title
Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 (HB0709)
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0161 (SB0096/CH0320) Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019) Delegate Mosby 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0250 (SB0374) Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0709 (SB0612) Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0825 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0943 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1209 /CH0730 Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1302 (SB0255) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Economic Matters
HB1305 (SB0261/CH0224) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required Delegate Ivey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0023 Child Support - Lien Against Monetary Award Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0095 /CH0261 Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 /CH0320 (HB0161) Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019) Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 /CH0224 (HB1305) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 (HB0250) Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0484 /CH0225 Tax Liens - Expiration Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557) Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 (HB0709) Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM