Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lieutenant Governor

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733
Title
Drunk Driving - State Officials - Mandatory Minimum Sentence
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State Officials
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Public Ethics - Former Members of the General Assembly, Legislative Branch Officials, and Executive Branch Officials - Lobbying Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269
Title
Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 /JR0002 (SJ0003/JR0001)
Title
Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant Governor
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 /JR0001 (HJ0003/JR0002)
Title
Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant Governor
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0733 Drunk Driving - State Officials - Mandatory Minimum Sentence Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State Officials Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1179 Public Ethics - Former Members of the General Assembly, Legislative Branch Officials, and Executive Branch Officials - Lobbying Restrictions Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0003 /JR0002 (SJ0003/JR0001) Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant Governor Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 2
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 /JR0001 (HJ0003/JR0002) Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant Governor President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM