Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Limited Liability Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
General Assembly - Advocating for or Directing an Entity to Hire a Member's Relative - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259
Title
Campaign Finance - Affiliated Business Entities - Attribution of Contributions
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 /CH0613
Title
Professional Engineers - Firm Permits
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0453 (SB0202/CH0452)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, C, and D Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Foreign Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 /CH0068 (SB0622/CH0067)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0469)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 (SB0554)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 /CH0676
Title
Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer Compliance
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Maximum Rate
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0175
Title
Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 /CH0452 (HB0372/CH0453)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469 (HB1246)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB1291)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 /CH0067 (HB0702/CH0068)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0142 General Assembly - Advocating for or Directing an Entity to Hire a Member's Relative - Prohibited Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0259 Campaign Finance - Affiliated Business Entities - Attribution of Contributions Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0347 /CH0613 Professional Engineers - Firm Permits Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 /CH0453 (SB0202/CH0452) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0404 Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, C, and D Licenses Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0540 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Foreign Entities Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0702 /CH0068 (SB0622/CH0067) Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0881 Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1246 (SB0469) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013 Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 (SB0554) Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 /CH0676 Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer Compliance Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Economic Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0001 Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Maximum Rate Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0070 /CH0175 Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0179 Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 /CH0452 (HB0372/CH0453) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0469 (HB1246) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB1291) Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0622 /CH0067 (HB0702/CH0068) Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 President 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM