Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Limited Liability Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0388 (SB0311)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special BWL Community Performing Arts Facility License MC 7-14
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0693)
Title
Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0960 (SB1025)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement MC 22-14
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 /CH0644
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 /CH0558 (SB0811/CH0557)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298 (SB0395)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308
Title
Limited Liability Companies - Fees - Young Adult-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365
Title
Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384
Title
Income Tax Credit - Pass-Through Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045
Title
Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 /CH0129
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0146/CH0388)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special BWL Community Performing Arts Facility License
Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 (HB1298)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447
Title
Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Presumption of a Conflict - Clients
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Maximum Rate
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 (HB0434)
Title
Personal Property Tax Returns - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 /CH0557 (HB1243/CH0558)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Nonpassive Income of a Pass-Through Entity
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, Class C, and Class D Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0146 /CH0388 (SB0311) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special BWL Community Performing Arts Facility License MC 7-14 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0268 Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0434 (SB0693) Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic Filing Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0960 (SB1025) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement MC 22-14 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1170 /CH0644 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirements Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 /CH0558 (SB0811/CH0557) Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1298 (SB0395) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 Limited Liability Companies - Fees - Young Adult-Owned Businesses Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1365 Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1384 Income Tax Credit - Pass-Through Entities Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0045 Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0106 /CH0129 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - Exemption Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0311 (HB0146/CH0388) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special BWL Community Performing Arts Facility License Montgomery County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0395 (HB1298) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Presumption of a Conflict - Clients Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0590 Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Maximum Rate Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0693 (HB0434) Personal Property Tax Returns - Electronic Filing Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0811 /CH0557 (HB1243/CH0558) Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0858 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Nonpassive Income of a Pass-Through Entity Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0888 Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, Class C, and Class D Licenses Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM