Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Limited Liability Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 (SB0993)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 (SB0395)
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages License – Registered Voter Requirements
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 (SB0498)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901 /CH0135
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Licenses and Transfers
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0225
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - Authorized
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0865)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1367 (SB1040)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot Point
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1510
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual Report
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1619
Title
Civil Actions - Nonattorney Representation - Corporations, Partnerships, LLCs, and Sole Proprietorships
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070
Title
Corporations – Limited Liability Companies – Member–Trustees – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 /CH0101
Title
Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Quantity and Resignation
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 (HB0448)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0876)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 (HB1095)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick Leave
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB0018)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1040 (HB1367)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot Point
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 (SB0993) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0448 (SB0395) Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages License – Registered Voter Requirements Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0613 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0876 (SB0498) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0901 /CH0135 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Licenses and Transfers Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 /CH0225 Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - Authorized Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1095 (SB0865) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1367 (SB1040) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot Point Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
HB1510 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual Report Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1619 Civil Actions - Nonattorney Representation - Corporations, Partnerships, LLCs, and Sole Proprietorships Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0070 Corporations – Limited Liability Companies – Member–Trustees – Establishment Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0082 /CH0101 Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Quantity and Resignation Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 (HB0448) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0498 (HB0876) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 (HB1095) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0890 Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick Leave Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0993 (HB0018) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1040 (HB1367) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot Point Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM