Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Limited Liability Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 (SB0003)
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682
Title
Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901 (SB0613)
Title
Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB0583)
Title
Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Class B and Class BNR Licenses
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0289
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 (HB1290)
Title
Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0901)
Title
Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0117 (SB0003) Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0165 Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
HB0204 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0682 Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0901 (SB0613) Online Consumer Protection Act Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 (SB0583) Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1408 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Class B and Class BNR Licenses Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0137 /CH0289 Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0409 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 (HB1290) Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0613 (HB0901) Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM