Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Limited Liability Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129
Title
Taxes - Election for Pass-Through Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0216)
Title
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Additional Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 /CH0379 (SB0174/CH0380)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983 /CH0400 (SB0888/CH0401)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1393
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual Report of a Low-Income Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1398 /CH0463
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1567 (SB0715)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 /CH0529
Title
Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 /CH0380 (HB0939/CH0379)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0074 (HB0141/CH0073)
Title
Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Corporation Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 (HB0439)
Title
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 /CH0641
Title
Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities and Corporations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB1567)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888 /CH0401 (HB0983/CH0400)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0129 Taxes - Election for Pass-Through Entities Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 (SB0216) Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0507 Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Additional Tax Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 /CH0379 (SB0174/CH0380) State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 379
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0983 /CH0400 (SB0888/CH0401) Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 400
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1393 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual Report of a Low-Income Limited Liability Company Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1398 /CH0463 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1567 (SB0715) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0115 /CH0529 Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 529
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0174 /CH0380 (HB0939/CH0379) State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0186 /CH0074 (HB0141/CH0073) Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Corporation Act - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 74
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0216 (HB0439) Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0523 /CH0641 Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities and Corporations Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0715 (HB1567) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 /CH0401 (HB0983/CH0400) Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 1:46 PM