Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Literacy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 (SB0638)
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910 (SB0548)
Title
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Education - Individual Reading Improvement Plans - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 /CH0361 (SB1092)
Title
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525 (SB0727)
Title
State Personnel – Employee Mentoring Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1657
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Maryland Reading Standards Matrix - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485
Title
Education - Maryland Early Literacy Initiative Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 (HB0910)
Title
Education – Students With Reading Difficulties – Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0493)
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0727 (HB1525)
Title
State Personnel - Employee Mentoring Leave
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092 (HB1415/CH0361)
Title
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0493 (SB0638) Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0910 (SB0548) Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1311 Education - Individual Reading Improvement Plans - Requirements Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 /CH0361 (SB1092) Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Ways and Means
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1525 (SB0727) State Personnel – Employee Mentoring Leave Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2018 - 1:15 PM
HB1657 Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Maryland Reading Standards Matrix - Established Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0485 Education - Maryland Early Literacy Initiative Program - Established Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0548 (HB0910) Education – Students With Reading Difficulties – Screenings and Interventions Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0638 (HB0493) Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0727 (HB1525) State Personnel - Employee Mentoring Leave Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 (HB1415/CH0361) Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM