Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Literacy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690 (SB0734/CH0512)
Title
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726 (SB0762)
Title
Child Support - Potential Income, Voluntary Impoverishment, and No Support Order
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733 (SB0661/CH0529)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 /CH0564 (SB0964)
Title
County Boards of Education - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421 /CH0391
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538
Title
Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 /CH0529 (HB0733)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0407
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 /CH0512 (HB0690)
Title
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762 (HB0726)
Title
Child Support - Potential Income, Voluntary Impoverishment, and No Support Order
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785
Title
Education - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Infants or Toddlers
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962
Title
Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1144/CH0564)
Title
County Boards of Education - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0690 (SB0734/CH0512) Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0726 (SB0762) Child Support - Potential Income, Voluntary Impoverishment, and No Support Order Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0733 (SB0661/CH0529) Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 /CH0564 (SB0964) County Boards of Education - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency Delegate Lehman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1421 /CH0391 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0661 /CH0529 (HB0733) Primary and Secondary Education - Community Schools - Established Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0678 /CH0407 State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0734 /CH0512 (HB0690) Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0762 (HB0726) Child Support - Potential Income, Voluntary Impoverishment, and No Support Order Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0785 Education - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Infants or Toddlers Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0962 Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0964 (HB1144/CH0564) County Boards of Education - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM