Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Litter

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 /CH0067
Title
Montgomery County - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Adoption of Local Ordinance MC 11-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0684)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0532)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB1019)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0982)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 /CH0067 Montgomery County - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Adoption of Local Ordinance MC 11-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0982 (SB0684) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1019 (SB0532) Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0532 (HB1019) Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0684 (HB0982) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM