Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Litter

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008
Title
Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Yard Waste
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 (SB0028)
Title
Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Baltimore County - Remediation of Illegal Dumping - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0042 (SB0060/CH0043)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Adoption of Local Ordinance
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321
Title
Prince George's County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags PG 401-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384 /CH0189 (SB0429/CH0190)
Title
Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654 (SB0209)
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899
Title
Illegal Dumping and Litter Control - Criminal Penalties and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 (HB0013)
Title
Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0043 (HB0077/CH0042)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Adoption of Local Ordinance
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0654)
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 /CH0190 (HB0384/CH0189)
Title
Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Yard Waste Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0013 (SB0028) Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0063 Baltimore County - Remediation of Illegal Dumping - Report Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0077 /CH0042 (SB0060/CH0043) Anne Arundel County - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Adoption of Local Ordinance Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 42
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0321 Prince George's County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags PG 401-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
HB0384 /CH0189 (SB0429/CH0190) Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 189
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0654 (SB0209) Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0899 Illegal Dumping and Litter Control - Criminal Penalties and Fund Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 (HB0013) Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0060 /CH0043 (HB0077/CH0042) Anne Arundel County – Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Adoption of Local Ordinance Senator Simonaire 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2020 - 2:15 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0209 (HB0654) Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0429 /CH0190 (HB0384/CH0189) Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 190
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:31 PM