Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Lobbying

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0124
Title
General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial Interests
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0480/CH0062)
Title
Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered Lobbyists
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0094
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872 (SB0422)
Title
Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0104
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002
Title
Public Ethics - Former Officials and Employees - Lobbying Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Public Ethics - Former Members of the General Assembly, Legislative Branch Officials, and Executive Branch Officials - Lobbying Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250
Title
Ethics - Lobbying Regulation - Associations Representing Counties or Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0019
Title
Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Certification to Authorize Lobbying and Electronic Filing of Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 /CH0020
Title
State Ethics Commission - Local Governments and School Boards - Compliance Enforcement
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0021
Title
Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Ethics Training Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 /CH0037
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Regulated Lobbyists - Late-Filing Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 (HB0872)
Title
Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480 /CH0062 (HB0220)
Title
Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered Lobbyists
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0124 General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial Interests Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0220 (SB0480/CH0062) Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered Lobbyists Delegate Jameson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
HB0270 /CH0094 General Provisions Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0872 (SB0422) Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 /CH0104 General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1002 Public Ethics - Former Officials and Employees - Lobbying Restrictions Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1179 Public Ethics - Former Members of the General Assembly, Legislative Branch Officials, and Executive Branch Officials - Lobbying Restrictions Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1250 Ethics - Lobbying Regulation - Associations Representing Counties or Municipal Corporations Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0019 Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Certification to Authorize Lobbying and Electronic Filing of Registration Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 /CH0020 State Ethics Commission - Local Governments and School Boards - Compliance Enforcement Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0092 /CH0021 Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Ethics Training Requirements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0129 /CH0037 Public Ethics - Officials and Regulated Lobbyists - Late-Filing Penalties Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 (HB0872) Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0480 /CH0062 (HB0220) Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered Lobbyists Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page