Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Lobbying

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234
Title
Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Officials
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518
Title
Public Ethics - Former Legislators - Lobbying
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 /CH0198
Title
Ethics Law - Statement by Person Providing Lobbyist Compensation and Making Campaign Contributions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 /CH0213
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0234 Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Officials Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0518 Public Ethics - Former Legislators - Lobbying Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1176 Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs Delegate Knotts 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB1272 Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0767 /CH0198 Ethics Law - Statement by Person Providing Lobbyist Compensation and Making Campaign Contributions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 /CH0213 Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page