Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lobbying

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130
Title
Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report (General Assembly Online Social Calendar)
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458 (SB0380)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726
Title
Ethics - Reports of Regulated Lobbyists - Open Data Format
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 (HB0458)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 /CH0201
Title
Ethics - Local Government - Conflict of Interest and Financial Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0130 Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report (General Assembly Online Social Calendar) Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0458 (SB0380) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0726 Ethics - Reports of Regulated Lobbyists - Open Data Format Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 (HB0458) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 /CH0201 Ethics - Local Government - Conflict of Interest and Financial Disclosure Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM