Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lobbying

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0617
Title
Public Ethics - Meals and Receptions - Governmental Unit That Employs an Individual Regulated Lobbyist
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872)
Title
Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0149
Title
Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222)
Title
Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0617 Public Ethics - Meals and Receptions - Governmental Unit That Employs an Individual Regulated Lobbyist Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872) Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
SB0079 /CH0149 Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/10/2019 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222) Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM