Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Lobbying

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190 (SB0348)
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 /CH0164 (SB0202)
Title
Public Ethics Violations and Crimes – Prohibitions and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 (SB0283)
Title
Ethics and Accountability in Government Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0185
Title
Bicounty Commissions - Annual Reports - Conflicts of Interest and Lobbying PG/MC 102-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0927)
Title
Public Ethics - Issue Lobbying Communications - Lobbyist Registration and Disclosure Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055 (SB0974)
Title
Public Ethics – Lobbyists – Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 (HB0315/CH0164)
Title
Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283 (HB0360)
Title
Ethics and Accountability in Government Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 (HB0190)
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 (HB0953)
Title
Public Ethics - Issue Lobbying Communications - Lobbyist Registration and Disclosure Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0974 (HB1055)
Title
Public Ethics - Lobbyists - Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0190 (SB0348) Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0315 /CH0164 (SB0202) Public Ethics Violations and Crimes – Prohibitions and Penalties Delegate Stewart 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 164
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0360 (SB0283) Ethics and Accountability in Government Act Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0370 /CH0185 Bicounty Commissions - Annual Reports - Conflicts of Interest and Lobbying PG/MC 102-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 185
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0953 (SB0927) Public Ethics - Issue Lobbying Communications - Lobbyist Registration and Disclosure Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1055 (SB0974) Public Ethics – Lobbyists – Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Ways and Means
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0202 (HB0315/CH0164) Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0283 (HB0360) Ethics and Accountability in Government Act President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0348 (HB0190) Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 (HB0953) Public Ethics - Issue Lobbying Communications - Lobbyist Registration and Disclosure Requirements Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Kagan)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0974 (HB1055) Public Ethics - Lobbyists - Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:24 PM