Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 /CH0317
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 (SB0873)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0382)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830 (SB0538)
Title
Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentists (Oral Health Access for Underserved Marylanders Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 (SB0604)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing, Health, and Economic Stability of Maryland Seniors
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0303 (SB0939)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB0896)
Title
Task Force to Study Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392
Title
Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 (HB0456)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0830)
Title
Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentists
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB0416)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896 (HB1300)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1181/CH0303)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0186 /CH0317 Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0279 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
HB0416 (SB0873) Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0456 (SB0382) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0830 (SB0538) Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentists (Oral Health Access for Underserved Marylanders Act) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0978 (SB0604) Task Force to Study Housing, Health, and Economic Stability of Maryland Seniors Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1181 /CH0303 (SB0939) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB0896) Task Force to Study Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 (HB0456) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 (HB0830) Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentists Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0873 (HB0416) Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0896 (HB1300) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1181/CH0303) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM