Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0670)
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 (SB0981)
Title
Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010
Title
Health Care Facilities – Discrimination (LGBTQ Senior Bill of Rights)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0863)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Long-Term Care Services and Supports - Personal Needs Allowance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107 (SB0022)
Title
Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 (SB0897)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Training Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 (SB0959)
Title
Public Health – Demonstration Program Developmental Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365 (SB0786)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Compliance with State Labor Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1652
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 (HB1107)
Title
Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786 (HB1365)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 (HB1091)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Long-Term Care Services and Supports - Personal Needs Allowance
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0897 (HB1168)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Training Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB1171)
Title
Public Health – Demonstration Program and Developmental Disabilities
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981 (HB0977)
Title
Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1062 (HB1635)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0564 (SB0670) Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0977 (SB0981) Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1010 Health Care Facilities – Discrimination (LGBTQ Senior Bill of Rights) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 (SB0863) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Long-Term Care Services and Supports - Personal Needs Allowance Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 (SB0022) Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 (SB0897) Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Training Requirements Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1171 (SB0959) Public Health – Demonstration Program Developmental Disabilities Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1365 (SB0786) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Compliance with State Labor Laws Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1652 Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0022 (HB1107) Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0690 Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0786 (HB1365) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0863 (HB1091) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Long-Term Care Services and Supports - Personal Needs Allowance Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0897 (HB1168) Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Training Requirements Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0959 (HB1171) Public Health – Demonstration Program and Developmental Disabilities Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0981 (HB0977) Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1062 (HB1635) Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 10:11 AM