Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Fantasy Competitions - Regulatory Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965 /CH0727
Title
The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1558
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Operation Licensee - Employee Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 /CH0044
Title
State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted Prizes
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 /CH0020
Title
State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Prize Payments
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 /CH0595
Title
Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980
Title
Gaming - Traditional Noncommercial Fantasy Competitions - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070 (HB1574)
Title
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements Speaker 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 Fantasy Competitions - Regulatory Authority Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0965 /CH0727 The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016 Delegate Walker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1558 Prince George's County - Video Lottery Operation Licensee - Employee Data Collection Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0078 /CH0044 State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted Prizes Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0111 /CH0020 State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Prize Payments Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 /CH0595 Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming Licenses Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0980 Gaming - Traditional Noncommercial Fantasy Competitions - Clarification Senator Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 (HB1574) Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM
Click to return on the top page