Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 (SB0496/CH0445)
Title
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 (SB0497/CH0446)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Term
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 /CH0447 (SB0438/CH0448)
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989
Title
Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Study and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230
Title
Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Voluntary Exclusion
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1537 /CH0449 (SB1125/CH0450)
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0448 (HB0813/CH0447)
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0445 (HB0090)
Title
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 /CH0446 (HB0093)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1123
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Procurements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0090 (SB0496/CH0445) Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 (SB0497/CH0446) Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Term Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0813 /CH0447 (SB0438/CH0448) State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0989 Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Study and Implementation Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1230 Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Voluntary Exclusion Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1537 /CH0449 (SB1125/CH0450) Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Expansion Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Ways and Means
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 /CH0448 (HB0813/CH0447) State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0445 (HB0090) Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0497 /CH0446 (HB0093) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1123 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Procurements Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (21-25)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM