Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317 (SB0260)
Title
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389
Title
Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025 (SB0932)
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 /CH0299
Title
Gaming - State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Regulation of Reconciliation of Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346
Title
Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1369 (SB0867)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries - Limits on Production and On-Premises Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260 (HB0317)
Title
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 /CH0336 (HB1622/CH0335)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415
Title
Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Workgroup to Study Data Collection to Assist Small Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 /CH0853 (HB1378)
Title
Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Regulation and Prohibition on Operation of Electronic Device
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932 (HB1025)
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1015
Title
Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Operators and Video Lottery Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten Programs Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0317 (SB0260) State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0389 Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1014 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering Delegate Turner 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 (SB0932) State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1171 /CH0299 Gaming - State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Regulation of Reconciliation of Proceeds Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Authorization and Implementation Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1369 (SB0867) Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries - Limits on Production and On-Premises Sales Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0260 (HB0317) State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0383 /CH0336 (HB1622/CH0335) Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0415 Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Workgroup to Study Data Collection to Assist Small Businesses Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 /CH0853 (HB1378) Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Regulation and Prohibition on Operation of Electronic Device Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 853
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0932 (HB1025) State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB1015 Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Operators and Video Lottery Facilities Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM