Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 (SB0059)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("ITLM" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1647
Title
Gaming – Task Force to Study Online Gaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0492
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 (HB0131)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 (SB0059) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("ITLM" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0169 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0225 Gaming - Sports Wagering - Implementation Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0344 Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0500 State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1126 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1430 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1647 Gaming – Task Force to Study Online Gaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0004 /CH0492 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0058 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 (HB0131) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0552 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Senator King 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0771 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:20 PM