Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 (SB0045)
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0452)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Prohibition on Internet Sales - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076
Title
Public Assistance Programs – Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224 (SB0850)
Title
Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Long Shot's
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 (HB0388)
Title
Use of Gaming Proceeds - Studies
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0532)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB1224)
Title
Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Long Shot’s
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871
Title
Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Washington County Minor League Baseball Team
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0371 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0388 (SB0045) State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0403 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0532 (SB0452) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0553 State Lottery Tickets - Prohibition on Internet Sales - Repeal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0940 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1076 Public Assistance Programs – Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2021) Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1224 (SB0850) Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Long Shot's Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0045 (HB0388) Use of Gaming Proceeds - Studies Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0452 (HB0532) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 (HB1224) Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Long Shot’s Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Washington County Minor League Baseball Team Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:24 AM
Click to return on the top page