Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lottery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372
Title
Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed Establishments
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 /CH0230
Title
Gaming - Emergency Suspension of License
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 /CH0231
Title
Gaming - Background Investigations
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535
Title
Veterans' Organizations - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Use of Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Elliott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864
Title
State Lottery Agency - Veterans Lottery - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023
Title
State Lottery - Proceeds - Parks and Recreation Departments
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 (SB0927)
Title
Public School Construction - Creative Financing Study
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 /CH0130
Title
State Lottery - Retailer Licenses - Background Investigations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0131
Title
State Lottery - Unlawful Representation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 /CH0293
Title
State Lottery - Task Force to Study Lottery Revenue
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 (HB1323)
Title
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0372 Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed Establishments Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0454 /CH0230 Gaming - Emergency Suspension of License Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0460 /CH0231 Gaming - Background Investigations Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0465 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0535 Veterans' Organizations - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Use of Proceeds Delegate Elliott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0864 State Lottery Agency - Veterans Lottery - Established Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 State Lottery - Proceeds - Parks and Recreation Departments Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1323 (SB0927) Public School Construction - Creative Financing Study Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0107 /CH0130 State Lottery - Retailer Licenses - Background Investigations Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 /CH0131 State Lottery - Unlawful Representation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0374 /CH0293 State Lottery - Task Force to Study Lottery Revenue Senator Currie 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 (HB1323) Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM