Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lottery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427
Title
Voters' Legislative Districting Panel - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428
Title
Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486 (SB0595/CH0311)
Title
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Hearing Committee
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0299
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Operation and Employee Licenses - Crimes or Acts of Moral Turpitude or Gambling
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 /CH0118
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0119
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Employee - Temporary License
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193 (SB0228)
Title
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 (HB1193)
Title
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 /CH0311 (HB0486)
Title
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683
Title
State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - Established
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Changes Affecting Proceeds - Legislative Approval
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0427 Voters' Legislative Districting Panel - Establishment Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0428 Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - Establishment Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0486 (SB0595/CH0311) Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Hearing Committee Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0299 Video Lottery Facilities - Operation and Employee Licenses - Crimes or Acts of Moral Turpitude or Gambling Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 /CH0118 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1115 /CH0119 Gaming - Video Lottery Employee - Temporary License Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1193 (SB0228) Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 (HB1193) Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0595 /CH0311 (HB0486) Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - Established Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0764 Video Lottery Terminals - Changes Affecting Proceeds - Legislative Approval Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM