Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lottery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0035
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Local Impact Grant Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 /CH0767 (SB0032)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Facility - Local Development Council Membership PG 403-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317 (SB0260)
Title
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB0454)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025 (SB0932)
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1721 /CH0184 (SB1158/CH0185)
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1806 (SB1254)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 (HB0130/CH0767)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260 (HB0317)
Title
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB0611)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932 (HB1025)
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1158 /CH0185 (HB1721/CH0184)
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1254 (HB1806)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten Programs Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0035 Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Local Impact Grant Distribution Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0130 /CH0767 (SB0032) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 767
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0181 Prince George's County - Video Lottery Facility - Local Development Council Membership PG 403-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0317 (SB0260) State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0611 (SB0454) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal Organizations Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 (SB0932) State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1721 /CH0184 (SB1158/CH0185) Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1806 (SB1254) Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0032 (HB0130/CH0767) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0260 (HB0317) State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0454 (HB0611) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal Organizations Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0932 (HB1025) State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB1158 /CH0185 (HB1721/CH0184) Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Finance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1254 (HB1806) Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM