Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Lottery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 (SB0059)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("ITLM" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435 (SB0338)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0569
Title
Gaming - Distribution of Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Hybrid Game of Chance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1596 (SB0051)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1659 (SB1076)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 (HB1596)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 (HB0131)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities and Licenses - Definitions
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 (HB0435)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0313)
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1076 (HB1659)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Fund
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 (SB0059) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("ITLM" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0225 Gaming - Sports Wagering - Implementation Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0266 Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0344 Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0435 (SB0338) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0500 State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0569 Gaming - Distribution of Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0630 Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Hybrid Game of Chance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1126 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1596 (SB0051) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1659 (SB1076) Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0004 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0051 (HB1596) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 (HB0131) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0079 Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities and Licenses - Definitions Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0338 (HB0435) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0442 (HB0313) Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0552 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Senator King 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0987 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
SB1023 Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1076 (HB1659) Maryland Stadium Authority - Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Fund Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/24/2020 8:02 AM