Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 /CH0576 (SB0904/CH0575)
Title
Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904 /CH0575 (HB1160/CH0576)
Title
Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1160 /CH0576 (SB0904/CH0575) Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts Delegate Kach 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0904 /CH0575 (HB1160/CH0576) Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider Contracts Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM