Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273 (SB0262)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0263 (SB0335)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 /CH0422 (SB0874)
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0802 /CH0426 (SB0198/CH0141)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance Marketplace
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235 /CH0449
Title
Community Integrated Medical Home Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 /CH0141 (HB0802/CH0426)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0273)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 (HB0761/CH0422)
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0273 (SB0262) Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0298 /CH0263 (SB0335) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 /CH0422 (SB0874) Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0802 /CH0426 (SB0198/CH0141) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine Delegate Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance Marketplace Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1235 /CH0449 Community Integrated Medical Home Program Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 /CH0141 (HB0802/CH0426) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Finance
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 (HB0273) Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014 Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0874 (HB0761/CH0422) Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM