Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0355 (SB0036)
Title
Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378
Title
Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 /CH0534
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Audit and Professional Dispensing Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846 (SB0482)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 (SB0498)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938 (SB0975)
Title
Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324 (SB1039)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0598 (HB0258/CH0597)
Title
Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization - Provider Fee
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482 (HB0846)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0847)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 /CH0424 (HB0814/CH0423)
Title
Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975 (HB0938)
Title
Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1324)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0127 /CH0355 (SB0036) Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0378 Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0546 Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - Definition Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0589 /CH0534 Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Audit and Professional Dispensing Fees Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 (SB0482) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0847 (SB0498) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0938 (SB0975) Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 (SB1039) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0239 /CH0598 (HB0258/CH0597) Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization - Provider Fee Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Finance
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Senator McCray 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0482 (HB0846) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0498 (HB0847) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 /CH0424 (HB0814/CH0423) Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0975 (HB0938) Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019 Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1039 (HB1324) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM