Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mandatory Retirement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0481 (SB0502)
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1141
Title
Prince George's County - County Employees - Taxation and Retirement PG 437-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 (HB0481)
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0481 (SB0502) Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1141 Prince George's County - County Employees - Taxation and Retirement PG 437-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0502 (HB0481) Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age Senator Miller 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM