Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Manslaughter

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477
Title
Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 (SB0861)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 /CH0650 (SB0872)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0847)
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 (HB1184)
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0478)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0909/CH0650)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0477 Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB0478 (SB0861) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0909 /CH0650 (SB0872) Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1184 (SB0847) Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 (HB1184) Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0478) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 (HB0909/CH0650) Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM