Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Manslaughter

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 /CH0020
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving Offenses – Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757 (SB0561/CH0388)
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide - Fetus
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 /CH0388 (HB0757)
Title
Criminal Law – Crime of Violence Against Pregnant Person – Enhanced Penalty (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0707 /CH0020 Drunk and Drugged Driving Offenses – Penalties Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Judiciary
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0757 (SB0561/CH0388) Criminal Law - Homicide - Fetus Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1121 Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0561 /CH0388 (HB0757) Criminal Law – Crime of Violence Against Pregnant Person – Enhanced Penalty (Laura and Reid’s Law) Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM