Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Manslaughter

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488 (SB0554)
Title
Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933
Title
Juvenile Offenders - Dual Sentencing
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 (SB1066)
Title
Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0488)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 (HB1090)
Title
Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0488 (SB0554) Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0933 Juvenile Offenders - Dual Sentencing Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 (SB1066) Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB0488) Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1066 (HB1090) Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/13/2020 11:37 AM