Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maps and Charts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic Area
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 (SB0391)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236
Title
Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of Map
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0325)
Title
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0361)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0907)
Title
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085 (SB0641)
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 /CH0674
Title
Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Deadline Extension
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 (HB0407)
Title
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 (HB0832)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 (HB0106)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB1085)
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0520
Title
Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0953)
Title
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic Area Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0106 (SB0391) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0236 Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of Map Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0407 (SB0325) Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0832 (SB0361) Congressional Districting Process Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0953 (SB0907) Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1085 (SB0641) Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1199 Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1257 /CH0674 Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Deadline Extension Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0325 (HB0407) Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 (HB0832) Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 (HB0106) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0641 (HB1085) Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0671 /CH0520 Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0907 (HB0953) Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM