Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maps and Charts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 (SB0094/CH0149)
Title
State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0665 (SB0675)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety Program
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 (SB0256)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0149 (HB0353)
Title
State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services Costs
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0881)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0665)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety Program
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0353 (SB0094/CH0149) State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services Costs Delegate Cullison 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0665 (SB0675) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety Program Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0881 (SB0256) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0149 (HB0353) State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services Costs Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 Congressional Districting Process Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0881) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Senator Pinsky 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 (HB0665) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety Program Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM