Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maps and Charts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substance Near Methadone Clinic - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234
Title
State Highways - Electronic Map of State Roads by State Legislative District
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458 (SB0380)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0700)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334
Title
Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 (HB0458)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB0699)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 Criminal Law - Illegal Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substance Near Methadone Clinic - Penalties Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0234 State Highways - Electronic Map of State Roads by State Legislative District Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0458 (SB0380) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0467 Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0699 (SB0700) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0334 Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 (HB0458) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 (HB0699) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM