Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maps and Charts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0252)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121 (SB1054)
Title
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0400)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0512
Title
Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary Maps
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 (HB0385)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 (HB1172)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1121)
Title
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0367 Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0385 (SB0252) Redistricting Reform Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Legislative and Congressional Districting Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1121 (SB1054) Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 (SB0400) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Finance
SB0002 /CH0512 Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary Maps Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0252 (HB0385) Redistricting Reform Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 (HB1172) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1121) Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM