Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maps and Charts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0157
Title
State Highways - Electronic Map of Public Trash Receptacles
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 /CH0177 (SB0968/CH0178)
Title
Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 (SB0307)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 /CH0176
Title
Rural Broadband Communication Services
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0628 (SB1006/CH0629)
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 (HB0356)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0968 /CH0178 (HB0243/CH0177)
Title
Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and Extension
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006 /CH0629 (HB1350/CH0628)
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0157 State Highways - Electronic Map of Public Trash Receptacles Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0243 /CH0177 (SB0968/CH0178) Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and Extension Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Economic Matters
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 (SB0307) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0961 /CH0176 Rural Broadband Communication Services Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 /CH0628 (SB1006/CH0629) Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0307 (HB0356) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0968 /CH0178 (HB0243/CH0177) Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and Extension Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1006 /CH0629 (HB1350/CH0628) Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM