Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maps and Charts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 (SB0090)
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377
Title
Natural Resources - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation Protection Zones - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669 (SB0387)
Title
Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703 /CH0517 (SB0505/CH0518)
Title
Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0729/CH0405)
Title
Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281 (SB0787)
Title
Transportation – Bikeways Network Program and Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412
Title
Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 (HB0043)
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB0669)
Title
Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 /CH0518 (HB0703/CH0517)
Title
Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 /CH0405 (HB0735)
Title
Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038 /CH0255
Title
Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 (SB0090) Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0067 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0377 Natural Resources - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation Protection Zones - Revisions Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0669 (SB0387) Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0703 /CH0517 (SB0505/CH0518) Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0735 (SB0729/CH0405) Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland Delegate Healey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1281 (SB0787) Transportation – Bikeways Network Program and Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1412 Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 (HB0043) Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB0669) Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019) Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Young)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0505 /CH0518 (HB0703/CH0517) Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0729 /CH0405 (HB0735) Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1038 /CH0255 Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit Senator Salling 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM