Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maps and Charts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0086 (SB0136)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 (SB0204)
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 (SB0424)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 (SB0548)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015
Title
Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 104-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080
Title
Coast Smart Siting and Design Criteria - Private Construction or Reconstruction Projects - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128
Title
Environment – Water Quality Certifications – Requests (Water Quality Certification Improvement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306 (SB0629)
Title
Natural Resources - SAV Protection Zones and Hydraulic Clam Dredges (Aquatic Habitat Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1389
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Geolocation Information and Unfair, Abusive, and Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132
Title
Property Tax - Assessment Reviews - Aids in Reviewing Property
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136 (HB0086)
Title
Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 (HB0182)
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 /CH0542
Title
Natural Resources - Wild Waterfowl Policy - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0424 (HB0368)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 (HB0390)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 (HB1306)
Title
Natural Resources - SAV Protection Zones and Hydraulic Clam Dredges (Aquatic Habitat Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0721
Title
Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0086 (SB0136) Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0182 (SB0204) Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0368 (SB0424) Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0390 (SB0548) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1015 Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 104-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1080 Coast Smart Siting and Design Criteria - Private Construction or Reconstruction Projects - Application Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1128 Environment – Water Quality Certifications – Requests (Water Quality Certification Improvement Act) Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 (SB0629) Natural Resources - SAV Protection Zones and Hydraulic Clam Dredges (Aquatic Habitat Protection Act) Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1389 Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Geolocation Information and Unfair, Abusive, and Deceptive Trade Practices Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0132 Property Tax - Assessment Reviews - Aids in Reviewing Property Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0136 (HB0086) Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0204 (HB0182) Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0242 /CH0542 Natural Resources - Wild Waterfowl Policy - Repeal Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0424 (HB0368) Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act) Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0548 (HB0390) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0629 (HB1306) Natural Resources - SAV Protection Zones and Hydraulic Clam Dredges (Aquatic Habitat Protection Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0721 Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/27/2020 12:54 PM