Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Marinas -see also- Piers and Docks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389 /CH0644
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Marijuana Laws - Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0272
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0389 /CH0644 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License Charles County Delegation 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 Marijuana Laws - Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0877 /CH0272 Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM