Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0047
Title
Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married Couples
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 /CH0348
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361 /CH0368
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380 /CH0617
Title
Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married Couples
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031 /CH0518 (SB0658/CH0517)
Title
Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0792)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 /CH0204
Title
Estates and Trusts - Family Allowance
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 /CH0517 (HB1031/CH0518)
Title
Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health Insurance
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 (HB1099)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0047 Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married Couples Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0056 /CH0348 State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Criminal History Records Checks Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0060 Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 /CH0368 Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0380 /CH0617 Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married Couples Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1031 /CH0518 (SB0658/CH0517) Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health Insurance Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1099 (SB0792) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 /CH0204 Estates and Trusts - Family Allowance Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 /CH0517 (HB1031/CH0518) Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health Insurance Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 (HB1099) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM