Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011 /CH0326 (SB0001/CH0325)
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016
Title
Marriage - Religious Organizations - Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167 (SB0578)
Title
Domestic Violence - Person Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 (SB0127)
Title
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646 (SB0593)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 /CH0125 (SB0715)
Title
Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - Applications
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0751)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 (SB0913)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 /CH0325 (HB0011/CH0326)
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0315)
Title
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB0167)
Title
Domestic Violence - Person Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB0832/CH0125)
Title
Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - Applications
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 (HB1229)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 /CH0326 (SB0001/CH0325) Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0016 Marriage - Religious Organizations - Protections Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0167 (SB0578) Domestic Violence - Person Eligible for Relief Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0315 (SB0127) Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0646 (SB0593) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0832 /CH0125 (SB0715) Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - Applications Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0911 Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 (SB0751) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 (SB0913) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0001 /CH0325 (HB0011/CH0326) Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0315) Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0578 (HB0167) Domestic Violence - Person Eligible for Relief Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0715 (HB0832/CH0125) Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - Applications Cecil County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0913 (HB1229) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1028 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM