Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0561
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 (SB0305)
Title
Commonsense Paid Leave Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 (SB0574)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484 (SB0861)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 (SB1047)
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0639
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0934
Title
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188
Title
Advisory Council on Couples Qualifying for Family Investment Administration Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0382)
Title
Commonsense Paid Leave Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0534 /CH0640
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0428)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0484)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047 (HB0864)
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0355 /CH0561 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0382 (SB0305) Commonsense Paid Leave Act Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 12:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/10/2017 - 12:30 PM
HB0428 (SB0574) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0484 (SB0861) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0799 Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0864 (SB1047) Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 /CH0639 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0934 Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 Advisory Council on Couples Qualifying for Family Investment Administration Benefits Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 (HB0382) Commonsense Paid Leave Act President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0534 /CH0640 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0574 (HB0428) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0484) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 (HB0864) Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM